THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:27:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine Anguilla, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Boulevard Décarie
MUHC/Royal Victoria Hospital
Gastroenterology
Montréal Québec H4A 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514-934-1934
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine Anguilla, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Boulevard Décarie
MUHC/Royal Victoria Hospital
Gastroenterology
Montréal Québec H4A 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514-934-1934
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTINA DANIELLA CANDIDO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CANDIDO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CANDIDO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CANDIDO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CANDIDO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. CANDIDO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. CANDIDO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
(1) Dr. KRISTINA DANIELLA CANDIDO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CANDIDO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CANDIDO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CANDIDO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CANDIDO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CANDIDO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CANDIDO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTINA DANIELLA CANDIDO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CANDIDO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CANDIDO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CANDIDO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CANDIDO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. CANDIDO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. CANDIDO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
(1) Dr. KRISTINA DANIELLA CANDIDO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CANDIDO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CANDIDO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CANDIDO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CANDIDO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CANDIDO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CANDIDO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine Anguilla, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
05 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 05 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025