THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:53:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Università degli Studi dell'Insubria Facoltà di Medicina e Chirurgia, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and PainManagement
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 00393200774154
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Università degli Studi dell'Insubria Facoltà di Medicina e Chirurgia, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and PainManagement
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 00393200774154
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTINA MONTI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MONTI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MONTI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MONTI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MONTI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MONTI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MONTI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 January, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTINA MONTI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MONTI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MONTI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MONTI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MONTI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MONTI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MONTI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 January, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Università degli Studi dell'Insubria Facoltà di Medicina e Chirurgia, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
10 Jan 2026 to 31 Jan 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2025 to 09 Jan 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
24 Oct 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Aug 2024 to 23 Oct 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 10 Jan 2026 to 31 Jan 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 09 Jan 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 24 Oct 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Aug 2024 to 23 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Jan 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jan 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2024