THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 19:33:59 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-500 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-500 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIT KOSTO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KOSTO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KOSTO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KOSTO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KOSTO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KOSTO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KOSTO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIT KOSTO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KOSTO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KOSTO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KOSTO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KOSTO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KOSTO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KOSTO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Aug 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
24 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Sep 2024 to 23 Nov 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 24 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Sep 2024 to 23 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2024