THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:44:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2023
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 227 Hamilton River Road
PO Box 7000
Station C
Happy Valley-Goose Bay Newfoundland and Labrador A0P 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2023

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 227 Hamilton River Road
PO Box 7000
Station C
Happy Valley-Goose Bay Newfoundland and Labrador A0P 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GERARD MICHAEL JAMES POWER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. POWER is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. POWER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. POWER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. POWER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times: when Dr. POWER is no longer enrolled in the postgraduate medical education program for which the certificate is issued; when Dr. POWER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada); or when fifteen weeks have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 09 May, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GERARD MICHAEL JAMES POWER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. POWER is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. POWER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. POWER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. POWER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times: when Dr. POWER is no longer enrolled in the postgraduate medical education program for which the certificate is issued; when Dr. POWER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada); or when fifteen weeks have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 09 May, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2023
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
EL - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
28 Apr 2025 to 09 May 2025
University of Toronto
EL - Family Medicine (Sport and Exercise Medicine)
29 Jul 2024 to 09 Aug 2024
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
DATE: 28 Apr 2025 to 09 May 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Family Medicine (Sport and Exercise Medicine)
DATE: 29 Jul 2024 to 09 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 09 May 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2024