THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/04/25 23:41:06 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pittsburgh School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Pittsburgh School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW DAVID SWATSKI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SWATSKI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. SWATSKI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SWATSKI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SWATSKI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SWATSKI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SWATSKI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW DAVID SWATSKI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SWATSKI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. SWATSKI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SWATSKI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SWATSKI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SWATSKI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SWATSKI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pittsburgh School of Medicine, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Gastroenterology
15 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2025 to 14 Jul 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Gastroenterology
DATE: 15 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 14 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024