THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 16:21:36 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Mount Sinai Hospital
Antimicrobial Stewardship Program
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +14165224281
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Mount Sinai Hospital
Antimicrobial Stewardship Program
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +14165224281
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TOMER HOFFMAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. HOFFMAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. HOFFMAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HOFFMAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HOFFMAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. HOFFMAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. HOFFMAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TOMER HOFFMAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. HOFFMAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. HOFFMAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HOFFMAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HOFFMAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. HOFFMAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. HOFFMAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
26 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Infectious Diseases
03 Sep 2024 to 25 Nov 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 26 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Infectious Diseases
DATE: 03 Sep 2024 to 25 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2024