THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 00:18:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
CHEO
Psychiatry
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Oct 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
CHEO
Psychiatry
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Oct 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DESTOUNIS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DESTOUNIS is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. DESTOUNIS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DESTOUNIS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DESTOUNIS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DESTOUNIS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DESTOUNIS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DESTOUNIS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DESTOUNIS is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. DESTOUNIS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DESTOUNIS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DESTOUNIS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DESTOUNIS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DESTOUNIS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
21 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
EL - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
29 Jul 2024 to 20 Oct 2024
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 21 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 29 Jul 2024 to 20 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2024