THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 05:28:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sefako Makgatho Health Science University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1493 Paris Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055237060
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Health Sciences North
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 7055237100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 07 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sefako Makgatho Health Science University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1493 Paris Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055237060
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Health Sciences North
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 7055237100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 07 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Nov 2024
30 Jun 2031
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 07 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2031
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARIETA VAN DER VYVER may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. VAN DER VYVER holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. VAN DER VYVER no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. VAN DER VYVER’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. VAN DER VYVER’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 07 November, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2031. Upon renewal of Dr. VAN DER VYVER's academic appointment at Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARIETA VAN DER VYVER may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. VAN DER VYVER holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. VAN DER VYVER no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. VAN DER VYVER’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. VAN DER VYVER’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 07 November, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2031. Upon renewal of Dr. VAN DER VYVER's academic appointment at Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sefako Makgatho Health Science University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2031