THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 04:04:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIANNE NABIL ABADIR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ABADIR is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ABADIR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ABADIR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ABADIR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ABADIR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ABADIR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIANNE NABIL ABADIR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ABADIR is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ABADIR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ABADIR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ABADIR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ABADIR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ABADIR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic and Clinical Pathology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic and Clinical Pathology
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
AVP - Diagnostic and Clinical Pathology
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic and Clinical Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic and Clinical Pathology
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Diagnostic and Clinical Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025