Medical School:
Shiraz University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
21 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Northern Ontario School of Medicine |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 20 Jul 2025 |
Northern Ontario School of Medicine |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
14 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Northern Ontario School of Medicine |
AVP - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 13 Oct 2024 |
Northern Ontario School of Medicine |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
21 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 20 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
14 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 13 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Northern Ontario School of Medicine