THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 08:39:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 263 McCaul Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 1W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 29 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 263 McCaul Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 1W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 29 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEANIE BETSY CHIANG may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CHIANG is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CHIANG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHIANG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHIANG shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. CHIANG ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. CHIANG ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEANIE BETSY CHIANG may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CHIANG is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CHIANG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHIANG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHIANG shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. CHIANG ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. CHIANG ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 2009
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025