THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 19:25:41 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria College of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria College of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHINYERE CLARE OBASI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. OBASI is enrolled at Northern Ontario School of Medicine;
(2) Dr. OBASI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. OBASI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. OBASI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. OBASI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. OBASI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHINYERE CLARE OBASI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. OBASI is enrolled at Northern Ontario School of Medicine;
(2) Dr. OBASI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. OBASI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. OBASI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. OBASI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. OBASI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria College of Medicine, 2009
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
AVP - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: AVP - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025