THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 15:31:57 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: LAU Gilbert and Rose-Marie Chagoury School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: LAU Gilbert and Rose-Marie Chagoury School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OBEY ALBAINI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALBAINI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. ALBAINI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALBAINI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALBAINI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALBAINI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALBAINI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OBEY ALBAINI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALBAINI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. ALBAINI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALBAINI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALBAINI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALBAINI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALBAINI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: LAU Gilbert and Rose-Marie Chagoury School of Medicine, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
AVP - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: AVP - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025