THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 08:15:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Università degli Studi di Padova Scuola di Medicina e Chirurgia, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1025 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416 535-8501
Extension: 34841
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Università degli Studi di Padova Scuola di Medicina e Chirurgia, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1025 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416 535-8501
Extension: 34841
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEATRICE TODESCO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TODESCO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. TODESCO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TODESCO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. TODESCO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. TODESCO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. TODESCO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEATRICE TODESCO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TODESCO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. TODESCO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TODESCO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. TODESCO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. TODESCO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. TODESCO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Università degli Studi di Padova Scuola di Medicina e Chirurgia, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2024