THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 19:57:25 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Haiti, 1952
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Jan 1964
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1964
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Haiti, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Jan 1964
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1964
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Haiti, 1952

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 04 Jan 1962
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1959
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 1962

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 1962

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Dec 1959