THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 02:53:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1958
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1965
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1965
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Digestive Health Clinic, 301-1366 Yonge Street, Toronto, Ontario M4T 3A7
Date Received: 10 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.M. Fisher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Feb 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1965
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1965
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Digestive Health Clinic, 301-1366 Yonge Street, Toronto, Ontario M4T 3A7
Date Received: 10 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.M. Fisher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Feb 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1958

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 May 1961
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1960
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1963

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 May 1961

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 1960