THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:39:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1958
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, OJIBWA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, OJIBWA
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 10 May 1991
Summary of Decision:
In May 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Cooper guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. The Committee further found Dr. Cooper guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he made improper use of the authority to prescribe, sell or dispense a drug, including falsifying a record in respect of a prescription or the sale of a drug, contrary to s. 27(26); in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 27(29); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32). Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Cooper(s licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1992-11-06
Hearing Date(s): May 10, 1991
    Application for Reinstatement: Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
    Decision Date: 15 Apr 1996
    Decision: Application Accepted

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 10 May 1991
Summary of Decision:
In May 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Cooper guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. The Committee further found Dr. Cooper guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he made improper use of the authority to prescribe, sell or dispense a drug, including falsifying a record in respect of a prescription or the sale of a drug, contrary to s. 27(26); in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 27(29); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32). Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Cooper(s licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1992-11-06
Hearing Date(s): May 10, 1991
    Application for Reinstatement: Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
    Decision Date: 15 Apr 1996
    Decision: Application Accepted

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1958

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 22 Sep 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 26 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 19 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1997
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 07 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1993
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 06 Nov 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1960
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 1997
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 1997

DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 1993

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 1993

DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 1960