THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:03:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1959
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 15 Nov 1965
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1965
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 162 Dianne Ave, Oakville,ON,,L6J H1
Date Received: 28 Apr 2022

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should send a written request to: 162 Dianne Ave, Oakville, ON, L6J 4H1; Fax: 905 845 3272
Date Received: 18 Nov 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 15 Nov 1965
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1965
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 162 Dianne Ave, Oakville,ON,,L6J H1
Date Received: 28 Apr 2022

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should send a written request to: 162 Dianne Ave, Oakville, ON, L6J 4H1; Fax: 905 845 3272
Date Received: 18 Nov 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1959

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 29 Apr 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1961
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1960
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 1961

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 1960