THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 21:01:25 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1960
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Panabaker has advised that his medical records were turned over to his colleagues at:

Georgetown Medical Associates
1A Princess Anne
Halton Hills, ON
L7G 4N4

The remaining medical records were sent to:

Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6

Tel: 416-398-0638
Toll free: 1-888-563-3732
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 11 Jul 2013

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to access a copy of their medical record should send a written request to:

Huron Shores FHT
527 Causley Street
Blind River, ON
P0R 1B0
Date Received: 24 May 2013

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Panabaker has advised that his medical records were turned over to his colleagues at:

Georgetown Medical Associates
1A Princess Anne
Halton Hills, ON
L7G 4N4

The remaining medical records were sent to:

Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6

Tel: 416-398-0638
Toll free: 1-888-563-3732
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 11 Jul 2013

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to access a copy of their medical record should send a written request to:

Huron Shores FHT
527 Causley Street
Blind River, ON
P0R 1B0
Date Received: 24 May 2013

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1960

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1961
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1960
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2013



DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1961

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1960