THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:04:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1961
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1966
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1966
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking for medical records may contact the address above.
Trillium Health Partners - Health Information Management
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8

Phone: 905-848-7181
Fax: 905-848-7677
Date Received: 03 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1966
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1966
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking for medical records may contact the address above.
Trillium Health Partners - Health Information Management
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8

Phone: 905-848-7181
Fax: 905-848-7677
Date Received: 03 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1961

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1962
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2016


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1962