THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:33:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: Freibergs, Arnis (Used Until: 18 Aug 1996)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1961
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 14 Nov 1967
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1967
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 201 Fenn Avenue
Toronto ON M2P 1Y1
Date Received: 27 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Freibergs, Arnis (Used Until: 18 Aug 1996)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 14 Nov 1967
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1967
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 201 Fenn Avenue
Toronto ON M2P 1Y1
Date Received: 27 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1961

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1962

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1962