THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:21:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1961
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Ontario M4V 1R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 525 7347
Fax: 416 489 9878
Address: 250 College St
Toronto Ontario M5T1L8
Phone: 416 535 8501
Extension: 33434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Nov 1967
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1967
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - Russell Street Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - Russell Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.G. Chamberlain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Ontario M4V 1R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 525 7347
Fax: 416 489 9878
Address: 250 College St
Toronto Ontario M5T1L8
Phone: 416 535 8501
Extension: 33434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Nov 1967
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1967
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - Russell Street Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - Russell Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.G. Chamberlain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
12 Jul 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 12 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from July 12, 2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Clive Gordon
Chamberlain, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
Chamberlain to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Chamberlain may not engage in the practice of conducting third party
reports in forensic psychiatry or custody and access matters.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from July 12, 2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Clive Gordon
Chamberlain, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
Chamberlain to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Chamberlain may not engage in the practice of conducting third party
reports in forensic psychiatry or custody and access matters.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1961

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1962
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1962