THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:23:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Naples, 1953
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Nov 1962
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1962
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Safe Store
2704 Hwy 20
Fonthill, ON
L0S 1E6

Tel: (905) 892-0010
Date Received: 09 May 2012

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph D. Vedova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Sep 2012

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Naples, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Nov 1962
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1962
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Safe Store
2704 Hwy 20
Fonthill, ON
L0S 1E6

Tel: (905) 892-0010
Date Received: 09 May 2012

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph D. Vedova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Sep 2012

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Naples, 1953

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1962
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1959


DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 1962

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 1959