THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 05:55:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1961
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 18 Oct 2000
Summary of Decision:
On October 18, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Tucker(s guilty plea and found him guilty of professional misconduct, in that he had been found guilty of an offence, in relation to his prescribing of controlled substances, that is relevant to his suitability to practice medicine. In addition, he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, in that he resigned membership from the California Medical Board in the face of allegations relating to his prescribing of controlled substances.

The Discipline Committee ordered a recorded reprimand, and a six-month suspension, three months of which will be suspended if he gives up most of his narcotic prescribing privileges (he will be permitted to prescribe small dosages of codeine).
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 18, 2000

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Discipline
Effective Date: 06 Jul 2007
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Eric Clinton Tucker to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

1. I, Dr. Eric Clinton Tucker, hereby resign from the College effective July 6, 2007 at 5:00 p.m.

2. I hereby undertake never to apply or re-apply for registration to practise medicine in Ontario.

4. I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees not to proceed with a discipline referral of allegations that I am incompetent and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, on the basis of an expert report and a Physician Review and Enhancement Program ("PREP"), the College has in its possession. The expert report concluded that I failed to meet the standard of practice of the profession and displayed a lack of knowledge, skill and judgment. The PREP report assessed me as functioning at the lowest level: Level 5-Critical Deficiency-Immediate Risk to Patient Safety.

7. I acknowledge that this undertaking is irrevocable.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 18 Oct 2000
Summary of Decision:
On October 18, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Tucker(s guilty plea and found him guilty of professional misconduct, in that he had been found guilty of an offence, in relation to his prescribing of controlled substances, that is relevant to his suitability to practice medicine. In addition, he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, in that he resigned membership from the California Medical Board in the face of allegations relating to his prescribing of controlled substances.

The Discipline Committee ordered a recorded reprimand, and a six-month suspension, three months of which will be suspended if he gives up most of his narcotic prescribing privileges (he will be permitted to prescribe small dosages of codeine).
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 18, 2000

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Discipline
Effective Date: 06 Jul 2007
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Eric Clinton Tucker to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

1. I, Dr. Eric Clinton Tucker, hereby resign from the College effective July 6, 2007 at 5:00 p.m.

2. I hereby undertake never to apply or re-apply for registration to practise medicine in Ontario.

4. I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees not to proceed with a discipline referral of allegations that I am incompetent and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, on the basis of an expert report and a Physician Review and Enhancement Program ("PREP"), the College has in its possession. The expert report concluded that I failed to meet the standard of practice of the profession and displayed a lack of knowledge, skill and judgment. The PREP report assessed me as functioning at the lowest level: Level 5-Critical Deficiency-Immediate Risk to Patient Safety.

7. I acknowledge that this undertaking is irrevocable.

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1961

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 27 Apr 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2005
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 19 Mar 2001
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 21 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 03 May 1967
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1962
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2005

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2001

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 1982

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1975

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 1967

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 03 May 1967

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 1962