THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 08:48:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1962
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1962

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Jan 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 11 Mar 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1963
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 1970

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 1969

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 1968

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 1964

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 1963

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1962