THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 04:06:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1962
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Nov 1967
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1967
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS
111 St. Regis Crescent S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6

416-398-0638
Date Received: 10 May 2019

Instructions/Address:
Paitents seeking access to a copy of their records can contact:
RSRS
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: 416-398-5932
Date Received: 09 Nov 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Nov 1967
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1967
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS
111 St. Regis Crescent S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6

416-398-0638
Date Received: 10 May 2019

Instructions/Address:
Paitents seeking access to a copy of their records can contact:
RSRS
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: 416-398-5932
Date Received: 09 Nov 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1962

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1963
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1963