THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 18:19:55 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1957
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 13 Nov 1963
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1963
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 13 Nov 1963
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1963
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 15 Jan 1985
Summary of Decision:
In January 1985, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Scott guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:

1. Dr. Scott(s licence was to be suspended for a period of 180 days. This suspension was itself to be suspended, subject to Dr. Scott(s compliance with the following conditions:

(a) Dr. Scott was to submit to an inspection of his practice of the kind contemplated by s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, not limited to a single act or occurrence, but to all or that part of his practice which the Registrar considered appropriate, to take place within six months of the date upon which this Order became final.

(b) If the Registrar was not satisfied with the report following the inspection, a further inspection might take place not more than eighteen months following receipt of the report covering the first inspection on the same terms and conditions.

Upon compliance with the above conditions, the suspension of licence was to be revoked. In the event of Dr. Scott(s failure to comply with any of the above conditions, the said suspension of licence was forthwith to come into force.

2. Dr. Scott was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee also recommended that his name be published. In the event that Dr. Scott failed to appear at the time and place set by the Registrar for his reprimand, his licence to practice was to be suspended until such time as he appeared for his reprimand.
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 14 Jan 1985

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 15 Jan 1985
Summary of Decision:
In January 1985, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Scott guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:

1. Dr. Scott(s licence was to be suspended for a period of 180 days. This suspension was itself to be suspended, subject to Dr. Scott(s compliance with the following conditions:

(a) Dr. Scott was to submit to an inspection of his practice of the kind contemplated by s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, not limited to a single act or occurrence, but to all or that part of his practice which the Registrar considered appropriate, to take place within six months of the date upon which this Order became final.

(b) If the Registrar was not satisfied with the report following the inspection, a further inspection might take place not more than eighteen months following receipt of the report covering the first inspection on the same terms and conditions.

Upon compliance with the above conditions, the suspension of licence was to be revoked. In the event of Dr. Scott(s failure to comply with any of the above conditions, the said suspension of licence was forthwith to come into force.

2. Dr. Scott was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee also recommended that his name be published. In the event that Dr. Scott failed to appear at the time and place set by the Registrar for his reprimand, his licence to practice was to be suspended until such time as he appeared for his reprimand.
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 14 Jan 1985

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1957

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 16 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1963
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1963