THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 06:16:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1962
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 20 Nov 1969
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1969
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 203-1585 Markham Road
Scarborough, Ontario M1B 2W1
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.P. Znajda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Queen's University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 20 Nov 1969
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1969
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 203-1585 Markham Road
Scarborough, Ontario M1B 2W1
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.P. Znajda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1962

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1963
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2022


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1963