THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 16:50:13 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 1956
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1964
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1964
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1964
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1964
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham, 1956

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 09 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Jul 1962
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1961
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1963

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1962

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 1961