THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:23:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Amsterdam, 1961
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, DUTCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Limited
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 13 Nov 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, DUTCH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Amsterdam, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Limited
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 13 Nov 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 01 May 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr.  Hendrik Hans Westenberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 1, 2022:
 
Following public complaints, the College conducted investigations into whether Dr. Westenberg engaged in sexual abuse of patients in his practice. In the face of the investigations, Dr. Westenberg resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 01 May 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr.  Hendrik Hans Westenberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 1, 2022:
 
Following public complaints, the College conducted investigations into whether Dr. Westenberg engaged in sexual abuse of patients in his practice. In the face of the investigations, Dr. Westenberg resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
 

Training

Medical School: University of Amsterdam, 1961

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 May 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1964
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 May 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 1964

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1962