THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 18:40:04 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1962
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Occupational Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1973
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Occupational Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Occupational Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1973
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Occupational Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1962

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1964
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1962
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 1964

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1962