THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 19:29:22 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1963
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 17 Nov 1969
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1969
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Thunder Bay Medical Centre Diagnostics
63 Algoma St N Suite 150
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4Z6
Date Received: 09 Jun 2021

Instructions/Address: Thunder Bay Ultrasound
1265 Arthur St E Suite 407
Thunder Bay P7E 6E7
Date Received: 09 Jun 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.R. Henderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 17 Nov 1969
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1969
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Thunder Bay Medical Centre Diagnostics
63 Algoma St N Suite 150
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4Z6
Date Received: 09 Jun 2021

Instructions/Address: Thunder Bay Ultrasound
1265 Arthur St E Suite 407
Thunder Bay P7E 6E7
Date Received: 09 Jun 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.R. Henderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 21 Jul 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1964
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1964

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1963