THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 00:56:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1963
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Gulens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 May 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Gulens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 May 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1964
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1964

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1963