THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:32:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dr. Malcolmson
Tel: (416) 488-8292
Fax: (416) 413-0016
Date Received: 08 Jun 2012

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dr. Malcolmson
Tel: (416) 488-8292
Fax: (416) 413-0016
Date Received: 08 Jun 2012

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 11 Jun 2009
Summary of Decision:
On June 11, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Malcolmson had committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient; and in that he had engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Malcolmson was Patient A’s psychiatrist from 2001 to 2003. Beginning in approximately 2001, Dr. Malcolmson engaged in a variety of sexual acts with Patient A, including intercourse; gave Patient A gifts and money; and travelled with Patient A. The sexual acts occurred in Dr. Malcolmson’s office, among other places.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar revoke Dr. Malcolmson’s certificate of registration immediately.
2. Dr. Malcolmson appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. Dr. Malcolmson pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.
4. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): June 11, 2009

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 11 Jun 2009
Summary of Decision:
On June 11, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Malcolmson had committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient; and in that he had engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Malcolmson was Patient A’s psychiatrist from 2001 to 2003. Beginning in approximately 2001, Dr. Malcolmson engaged in a variety of sexual acts with Patient A, including intercourse; gave Patient A gifts and money; and travelled with Patient A. The sexual acts occurred in Dr. Malcolmson’s office, among other places.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar revoke Dr. Malcolmson’s certificate of registration immediately.
2. Dr. Malcolmson appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. Dr. Malcolmson pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.
4. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): June 11, 2009

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 11 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 15 Sep 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1965
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 1981

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 1979

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1965

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1964