THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 03:21:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 21 Nov 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 21 Nov 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 20 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 15 Sep 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1965
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2015



DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 1970

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 1969

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1965

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1964