THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:27:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 16 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Date Received: 19 May 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jerry Shime Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Aug 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 16 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Date Received: 19 May 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jerry Shime Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Aug 2016

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1965
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1965

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1964