THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:23:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Quest Community Health Centre
Suite 100
145 Queenston Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 2Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 688-2558
Extension: 246
Fax: (905) 688-4678

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to:

P O Box 566
Virgil, ON
L0S 1T0
Date Received: 18 Jan 2011

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Quest Community Health Centre
Suite 100
145 Queenston Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 2Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 688-2558
Extension: 246
Fax: (905) 688-4678

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to:

P O Box 566
Virgil, ON
L0S 1T0
Date Received: 18 Jan 2011

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES STEWART BROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOKS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES STEWART BROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOKS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1965
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1965

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1964