THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:31:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1962
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: All medical records stored DOCUdavit Solutions inc. Address: 28 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON, M6B 3Z4. Tel: 416-781-9083
Date Received: 19 Feb 2020

Instructions/Address: All medical records stored DOCUdavit Solutions inc. Address: 26 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON, M6B 3Z4. Tel: 416-881-9083
Date Received: 09 Dec 2019

Instructions/Address: DOCUdavit Solutions Inc.
28 Eugene St
North York, ON M6B 3Z4
Date Received: 02 Dec 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L.V. Zeilig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Dec 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: All medical records stored DOCUdavit Solutions inc. Address: 28 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON, M6B 3Z4. Tel: 416-781-9083
Date Received: 19 Feb 2020

Instructions/Address: All medical records stored DOCUdavit Solutions inc. Address: 26 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON, M6B 3Z4. Tel: 416-881-9083
Date Received: 09 Dec 2019

Instructions/Address: DOCUdavit Solutions Inc.
28 Eugene St
North York, ON M6B 3Z4
Date Received: 02 Dec 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L.V. Zeilig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Dec 2020

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 30 Nov 2019
Summary:
Dr. Zeilig has resigned from the College effective November 30, 2019. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 30 Nov 2019
Summary:
Dr. Zeilig has resigned from the College effective November 30, 2019. 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1962

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 23 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 03 May 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1965
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1962
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 23 May 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 03 May 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1965

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1962