THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:28:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1964
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records location as per above.
Medpoint Healthcare Centre
233 - 355 Wellington St
London, ON N6A 3N7
Tel: (519) 432-1919
Date Received: 24 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records location as per above.
Medpoint Healthcare Centre
233 - 355 Wellington St
London, ON N6A 3N7
Tel: (519) 432-1919
Date Received: 24 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1964

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 12 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1965
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 1970

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 1970

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1965

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1964