THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 04:28:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6
Website: www.rsrs.com
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 14 May 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6
Website: www.rsrs.com
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 14 May 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1965
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2014


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 1965

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1964