THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 20:05:48 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1964
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients requesting a copy of their medical record should contact:

Records Management Ltd
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3

Telephone: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: 647-933-2904
Email: [email protected]
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 01 Oct 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients requesting a copy of their medical record should contact:

Records Management Ltd
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3

Telephone: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: 647-933-2904
Email: [email protected]
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 01 Oct 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 23 Apr 1993
Summary of Decision:
In April 1993, Dr. Orbeck pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct for failing to provide within a reasonable time and without cause a report requested by a patient(s authorized agent in respect of an examination and treatment as defined in s.27(27) of Ontario Regulation 448/80. The Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Orbeck(s guilty plea, and found him guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(27), 448/80. Furthermore, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Orbeck guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as unprofessional as defined in s.27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80. The Committee imposed the following penalty:

1. Dr. Orbeck be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register;

2. Dr. Orbeck be fined the maximum amount of $5,000;

3. The imposition of the fine be suspended provided Dr. Orbeck is not proven guilty of professional misconduct for failing to provide a report to a patient or to a patient(s representative or for unprofessional conduct related to a failure to cooperate with the College, within a five year period from the date that this order becomes final; and

4. Should such a finding result in the suspension of this fine being vacated, failure to pay shall result in the Registrar suspending Dr. Orbeck(s licence to practise medicine until such time as the fine is paid.

Dr. Orbeck waived his right to appeal and the reprimand was administered.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 23 Apr 1993

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 19 Jul 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kenneth William Orbeck to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 19, 2024:

Following concerns about his standard of practice, Dr. Orbeck underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report raised continued concerns about his general medicine practice. As a result:

 
Dr. Orbeck will not see or treat patients under the age of eighteen
(18) years old.

Dr. Orbeck will resign from the College no later than September 30, 2024, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Dr. Orbeck will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College until his resignation date.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 23 Apr 1993
Summary of Decision:
In April 1993, Dr. Orbeck pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct for failing to provide within a reasonable time and without cause a report requested by a patient(s authorized agent in respect of an examination and treatment as defined in s.27(27) of Ontario Regulation 448/80. The Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Orbeck(s guilty plea, and found him guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(27), 448/80. Furthermore, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Orbeck guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as unprofessional as defined in s.27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80. The Committee imposed the following penalty:

1. Dr. Orbeck be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register;

2. Dr. Orbeck be fined the maximum amount of $5,000;

3. The imposition of the fine be suspended provided Dr. Orbeck is not proven guilty of professional misconduct for failing to provide a report to a patient or to a patient(s representative or for unprofessional conduct related to a failure to cooperate with the College, within a five year period from the date that this order becomes final; and

4. Should such a finding result in the suspension of this fine being vacated, failure to pay shall result in the Registrar suspending Dr. Orbeck(s licence to practise medicine until such time as the fine is paid.

Dr. Orbeck waived his right to appeal and the reprimand was administered.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 23 Apr 1993

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 19 Jul 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kenneth William Orbeck to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 19, 2024:

Following concerns about his standard of practice, Dr. Orbeck underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report raised continued concerns about his general medicine practice. As a result:

 
Dr. Orbeck will not see or treat patients under the age of eighteen
(18) years old.

Dr. Orbeck will resign from the College no later than September 30, 2024, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Dr. Orbeck will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College until his resignation date.

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1964

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Sep 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 19 Jul 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 23 May 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 23 Mar 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1965
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 23 May 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 1965