THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:21:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Johannes Gutenberg University at Mainz, 1961
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, LITHUANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene St,
North York, ON
M6B 3Z4

Tel: 1-(888) 781-9083
Date Received: 28 Jun 2020

Instructions/Address: DocuDavit Solutions
1-(888) 781-9083
Date Received: 28 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, LITHUANIAN
Medical School: Johannes Gutenberg University at Mainz, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene St,
North York, ON
M6B 3Z4

Tel: 1-(888) 781-9083
Date Received: 28 Jun 2020

Instructions/Address: DocuDavit Solutions
1-(888) 781-9083
Date Received: 28 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 03 Jan 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Spudas to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 3, 2020:

Dr. Spudas has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 03 Jan 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Spudas to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 3, 2020:

Dr. Spudas has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services. 

Training

Medical School: Johannes Gutenberg University at Mainz, 1961

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1965
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1963
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 1965

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 1963