THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:46:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 1953
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 15 Nov 1965
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1965
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For copies of medical records for Dr. Philips, please call 905.886.4497
Date Received: 06 Aug 2013

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 15 Nov 1965
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1965
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For copies of medical records for Dr. Philips, please call 905.886.4497
Date Received: 06 Aug 2013

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 1953

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1966
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2013


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1966

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1963