THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:34:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1965
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 06 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records location as per above.
Port Arthur Health Centre
194 Court St N
Thunder Bay, ON P7A 4V7
Tel: 807-346-1000
Date Received: 02 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Hoffman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 06 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records location as per above.
Port Arthur Health Centre
194 Court St N
Thunder Bay, ON P7A 4V7
Tel: 807-346-1000
Date Received: 02 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Hoffman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1965

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1966
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1966

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1965