THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:09:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1970
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
MCI Medical Clinics INC., 1 Yorkdale Road, Suite 320, Toronto, ON M6A 3A1
Date Received: 01 May 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1970
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
MCI Medical Clinics INC., 1 Yorkdale Road, Suite 320, Toronto, ON M6A 3A1
Date Received: 01 May 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1964

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1966
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1966

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1964