THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:43:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1964
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Active Care Medical Centre
1108 Klondike Road
Kanata ON K2K 0G1

Phone: (613)-254-9777
Fax: (613)-254-9778
Date Received: 28 Oct 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Active Care Medical Centre
1108 Klondike Road
Kanata ON K2K 0G1

Phone: (613)-254-9777
Fax: (613)-254-9778
Date Received: 28 Oct 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1964

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 17 Jan 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1966
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1966
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2014


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 1970

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 1968

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 1966

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1966