THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 00:05:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1951
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jan 1964
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1964
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
AIM Health Group
Unit B22
550 Terminal Avenue
Ottawa ON K1G 0Z3
Date Received: 16 Sep 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jan 1964
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1964
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
AIM Health Group
Unit B22
550 Terminal Avenue
Ottawa ON K1G 0Z3
Date Received: 16 Sep 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1951

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Nov 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1967

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2014


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 1967