THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 06:11:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1963
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 01 Jan 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6

Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 30 Nov 2010

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 01 Jan 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6

Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 30 Nov 2010

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1967
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2013


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 1967

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1963