THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:18:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1963
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Nov 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record can contact:

File Bank
Tel: 1-800-377-3453
Date Received: 12 Mar 2019

Instructions/Address: Dr. Sidney Kardash has indicated that former patients may email him at [email protected] to request copies of their medical records
Date Received: 14 Aug 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Nov 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record can contact:

File Bank
Tel: 1-800-377-3453
Date Received: 12 Mar 2019

Instructions/Address: Dr. Sidney Kardash has indicated that former patients may email him at [email protected] to request copies of their medical records
Date Received: 14 Aug 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 23 Apr 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 05 Feb 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1967
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1969

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 1967