THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:34:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1966
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Oshawa Clinic
117 King St E
Oshawa ON
Date Received: 27 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Oshawa Clinic
117 King St E
Oshawa ON
Date Received: 27 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1966

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 May 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1967
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 15 May 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 1967